Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/28/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/09/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/04/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/04/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/04/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/04/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/04/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/04/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/04/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/16/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/16/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/16/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 11/16/2001
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/24/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/24/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/24/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/24/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/24/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/24/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/24/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/24/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/24/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/07/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/07/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/07/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/07/2002