Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/02/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/02/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/02/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/02/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/02/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/02/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/02/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/07/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/07/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/07/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/08/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/16/2002