There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress that the United States should develop, promote, and implement policies to reduce emissions of fossil fuel generated carbon dioxide with the goal of achieving stabilization of greenhouse gas emissions in the United States at the 1990 level by the year 2010.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/04/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/16/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality.
04/04/2001Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/04/2001Introduced in House

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/24/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/08/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/08/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/08/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/17/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/17/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/12/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/12/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/12/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/18/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/26/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/04/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/16/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/04/2001 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality04/16/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.117.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.117. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/04/2001)

Expresses the sense of Congress that the United States should develop, promote, and implement, at the earliest possible time, policies to reduce domestic emissions of fossil fuel generated carbon dioxide and other greenhouse gases, with the goal of achieving stabilization of greenhouse gas emissions in the United States at the 1990 level by the year 2010.