Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/25/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/26/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/01/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/03/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/15/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/15/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/16/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/16/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/16/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/21/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/22/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/25/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/06/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/29/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/29/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 01/29/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/29/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/29/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/07/2002