There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Calling for the immediate and unconditional release from prison of certain Kurdish members of the Parliament of the Republic of Turkey.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/07/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/11/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe.
05/07/2001Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
05/07/2001Introduced in House

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/07/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/07/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/07/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/19/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/19/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/19/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/19/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/19/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/19/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/25/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/25/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/25/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/25/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/25/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/25/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/25/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/25/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/25/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/25/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/02/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/12/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/08/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/18/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/18/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations05/07/2001 Referred to
House International Relations Subcommittee on Europe06/11/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.133.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.133. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/07/2001)

Declares that the immediate and unconditional release from prison in Turkey of the Kurdish Democracy Party parliamentarians Leyla Zana, Hatip Dicle, Orhan Dogan, and Selim Sadak is a vital step in upholding due process in Turkey and facilitating Turkey's integration into the European Union.