Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/07/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/07/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/07/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/19/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/19/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/19/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/19/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/19/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/19/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/25/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/25/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/25/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/25/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/25/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/25/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/25/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/25/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/25/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/25/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/02/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/12/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/08/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/18/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/18/2002