Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/24/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/02/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/05/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/13/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/13/2002