Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/30/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/13/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/13/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/21/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/27/2001