Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/24/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/24/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/12/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/12/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/12/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/12/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/18/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/18/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/18/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/18/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/18/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/18/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/18/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/18/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/18/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/18/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/18/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/18/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/18/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/18/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/18/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/18/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/18/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/18/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/19/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/19/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/20/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/21/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/25/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/25/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/27/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/28/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/10/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/10/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/10/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/17/2001
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/24/2001