There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that machine-readable privacy policies and the Platform for Privacy Preferences Project specification, commonly known as the P3P specification, are important tools in protecting the privacy of Internet users, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/07/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
07/09/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology and Procurement Policy.
06/18/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection.
06/07/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/07/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/07/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/07/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/07/2001Introduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/20/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/10/2001

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/07/2001 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection06/18/2001 Referred to
House Administration06/07/2001 Referred to
House Government Reform06/07/2001 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Technology and Procurement Policy07/09/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.159.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.159. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/07/2001)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that machine-readable privacy policies and the Platform for Privacy Preferences Project specification, commonly known as the P3P specification, are important tools in protecting the privacy of Internet users.

Calls for: (1) commercial and nonprofit web site operators, Members of Congress and their offices, and executive departments and agencies to deploy P3P-compliant privacy policies on their web sites; (2) legislation relating to online privacy to consider such specification; (3) the education of Internet users concerning such specification; and (4) commercial software developers to fully implement such specification.