Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/08/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/08/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/13/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/13/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/13/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/19/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/19/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/19/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/19/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 06/19/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/19/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/19/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/19/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/19/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/19/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/19/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/20/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/20/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/25/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/25/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/25/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/25/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/25/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/25/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/25/2001