Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/24/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/24/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 08/02/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/12/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/26/2002