Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/21/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/21/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/21/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/21/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/21/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/21/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/21/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/21/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/21/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/21/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/21/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/21/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/12/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/12/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/08/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/08/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/15/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/24/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/17/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/07/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/07/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/07/2002