There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning bigotry and violence against Sikh Americans in the wake of terrorist attacks against the United States on September 11, 2001.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/04/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/27/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
10/04/2001Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
10/04/2001Introduced in House

Cosponsors (132)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 10/04/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/04/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/04/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/04/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 10/04/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/04/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/10/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/10/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/10/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/10/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/10/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/10/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/10/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/10/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/10/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/01/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/01/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/01/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/01/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/01/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/01/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/01/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/04/2001 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution11/27/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.255. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/04/2001)

Declares that, in the quest to identify, locate, and bring to justice the perpetrators and sponsors of the September 11, 2001 terrorist attacks on the United States, the civil rights and liberties of all Americans, including Sikh-Americans, should be protected.

Condemns bigotry and acts of violence or discrimination against any Americans, including Sikh-Americans.

Calls upon local and Federal law enforcement authorities to: (1) work to prevent hate crimes against all Americans; and (2) prosecute to the fullest extent of the law all those who commit hate crimes.