Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/07/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/08/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/08/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/08/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/08/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/08/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/08/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/08/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 11/08/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/13/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/13/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/13/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/13/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/13/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/13/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/13/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/13/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/13/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 11/13/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/14/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/14/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/14/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/14/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/14/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 11/15/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/15/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/15/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 11/27/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/27/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/27/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/27/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/27/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/27/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/27/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 11/27/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/27/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/27/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/27/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/27/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/27/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/27/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/27/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/27/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/29/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/29/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/29/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/04/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/05/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/05/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/05/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/13/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/13/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 12/17/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 12/20/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/27/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/13/2002