Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/27/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 12/05/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 12/11/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/11/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 12/12/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 12/18/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/23/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/05/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/14/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/27/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/27/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/20/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/24/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/09/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/17/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/23/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/23/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/24/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/04/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/04/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/04/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/09/2002