Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 11/29/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/29/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/29/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/30/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/30/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/30/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/30/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/30/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/30/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 12/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 12/04/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/04/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/04/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/04/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/04/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 12/04/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/05/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 12/05/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/05/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/05/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/11/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 12/11/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 12/11/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 12/11/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/11/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/11/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/11/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/11/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/13/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/13/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/13/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 12/13/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 12/13/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/13/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/13/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/18/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/18/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 12/18/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/18/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/18/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/18/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/18/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/12/2002