Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 12/05/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 12/05/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/17/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 12/17/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 12/17/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/17/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 12/20/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 12/20/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 12/20/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/20/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/07/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/07/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/07/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/07/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/07/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/07/2002
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/07/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/07/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/11/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/11/2002