Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/12/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/12/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/12/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/12/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/12/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/13/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/13/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/13/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/13/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/13/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/13/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/26/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/26/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/06/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/06/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/19/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/19/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/07/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/15/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/10/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew