Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/11/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/16/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/01/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/22/2002