Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/18/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/18/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/18/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/30/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/30/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/30/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/30/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/30/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/30/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/30/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/07/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/09/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/09/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/22/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/22/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/12/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/25/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/25/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/25/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/25/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/25/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/25/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/25/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/08/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/08/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/08/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/08/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/08/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/09/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/09/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/09/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/09/2002