Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/08/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/08/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/08/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/11/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/23/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/23/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/23/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/23/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/26/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/26/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/26/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/26/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/26/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/26/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/09/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/09/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/11/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/11/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/26/2002