Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/02/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/06/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/20/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/20/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/25/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/09/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/10/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/10/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/15/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/15/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/15/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/15/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/15/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/15/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/16/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/16/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/18/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/22/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/22/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/24/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/04/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/04/2002