There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress regarding the International Criminal Court.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/09/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/09/2002Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
05/09/2002Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E775)
05/09/2002Introduced in House

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/14/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/23/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/10/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/11/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/12/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/13/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/17/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/16/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations05/09/2002 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.416.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.416. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/09/2002)

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) President Bush should be commended for renouncing the U.S. signature from the Rome Statute of the International Criminal Court (ICC) as a step toward protecting American service-members and citizens from the possibility of unwarranted and politically-motivated prosecutions; (2) President Bush should be encouraged to remain steadfast in his intention of protecting such individuals from the unchecked power of the ICC; and (3) Congress should take all steps necessary to grant appropriate authority to the President to defend the American people from the threat of arrest, prosecution, and conviction by the ICC.