Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/13/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/17/2002