Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/14/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/23/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/10/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/11/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/12/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/13/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/17/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/16/2002