Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/24/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/24/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/24/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/24/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/24/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/24/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/24/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/24/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/24/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/24/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/24/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/24/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/24/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/24/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/24/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/24/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/24/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/24/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/24/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/24/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/24/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/24/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/24/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/24/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/24/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/24/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/24/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/24/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/24/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/24/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/24/2002
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/24/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/24/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/24/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/24/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/24/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/24/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/24/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/24/2002
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/24/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/24/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/24/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/24/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/24/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/24/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/24/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/24/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/26/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/26/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/26/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/26/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/26/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/19/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/19/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/19/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/19/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/19/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/19/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/19/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/19/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/19/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/19/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/19/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/19/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/19/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/01/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/01/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/01/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/01/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/01/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/01/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/01/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 10/01/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/01/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/01/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/01/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/01/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/01/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/01/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/01/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/01/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/09/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/09/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/16/2002