Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/06/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/06/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/06/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/06/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/06/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/06/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/06/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 06/06/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/12/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/12/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/12/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/12/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/20/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/20/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/20/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/20/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/20/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/20/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/08/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/08/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/08/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/08/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/11/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/11/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/15/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 07/15/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/15/2002