Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/25/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/25/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/26/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/18/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/18/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/18/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/18/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/18/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/01/2002