Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 07/15/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/15/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/15/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/15/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/18/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/18/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/18/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/18/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/22/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/22/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/22/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/25/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/04/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/04/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/04/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/17/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/25/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/25/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/25/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/14/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/14/2002