Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/06/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/06/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/13/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/13/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/14/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/14/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/14/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/14/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/20/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/30/2001