Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/03/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/03/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/07/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/10/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/15/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/16/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/14/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/14/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 11/14/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 11/14/2002