Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/13/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/22/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/08/2001