Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/21/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/25/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/01/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/01/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/19/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/29/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/09/2002