Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 06/08/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/18/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/18/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/26/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/26/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/26/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 08/03/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 12/04/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 12/14/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/14/2001