Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/14/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 06/14/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 06/14/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/19/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/19/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/20/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/20/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/21/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/25/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/28/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/28/2001
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/29/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/24/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/25/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/25/2001