Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/18/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/12/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/20/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/25/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/04/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/05/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/29/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/11/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/15/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/20/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/15/2002