Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 06/14/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 06/14/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/19/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/20/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/22/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/17/2001
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/19/2002