Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/09/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/17/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/23/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/25/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/08/2002