Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 06/21/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/25/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/27/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/27/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/06/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/06/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/06/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/06/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/06/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/06/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/07/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/27/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/27/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/15/2002