Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 06/27/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/31/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/10/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/04/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 10/09/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/15/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 10/15/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/15/2001