Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/28/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/10/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/10/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/10/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/10/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/23/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/23/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/23/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/23/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/23/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/23/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 08/02/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/02/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 08/02/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/04/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/04/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/19/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/25/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/25/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 12/11/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 12/11/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 12/20/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/20/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 01/23/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/12/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/27/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/04/2002