Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/29/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/11/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/20/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/20/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/20/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/20/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/24/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/26/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/04/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/04/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 09/05/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/05/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/06/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/10/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/12/2001
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/13/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/14/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/14/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/19/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/02/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/02/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/02/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/15/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/15/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/30/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 10/30/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/31/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/01/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 11/13/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/15/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/27/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/27/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 12/03/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/06/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 12/18/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 01/24/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/04/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/07/2002
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 02/15/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/06/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/07/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/18/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/18/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/08/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/08/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/12/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/24/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/13/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/16/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/21/2002
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/11/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/02/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/02/2002