There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title III of the Stewart B. McKinney Homeless Assistance Act (42 U.S.C. 11331 et seq.) to reauthorize the Federal Emergency Management Food and Shelter Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/03/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9001; text: CR S9001)
08/02/2001Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
06/29/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/14/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/05/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
09/05/2001-2:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/05/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9001; text: CR S9001)
08/02/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 129.
08/02/2001SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
08/02/2001SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/29/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7201)
06/29/2001SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7200)

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/29/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/26/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Governmental Affairs06/29/2001 Referred to
08/02/2001 Markup by
08/02/2001 Reported by
House Financial Services09/05/2001 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity09/14/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1144.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1144. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (08/02/2001)

Amends the Stewart B. McKinney Homeless Assistance Act to: (1) authorize appropriations through FY 2004 for the Federal emergency management food and shelter programs; (2) require the participation of homeless individuals on local boards; and (3) revise the name of The Council of Jewish Federations, Inc. (nominating organization) as the United Jewish Communities.