Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 07/11/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/11/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/04/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/04/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/15/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 11/15/2001