Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/06/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/11/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 11/14/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/19/2002