Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 07/19/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/25/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/30/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/01/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/04/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/26/2001