Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 07/19/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/24/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/31/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/31/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/01/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 08/01/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 08/01/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/05/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/06/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/10/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/19/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/21/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/26/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/03/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/04/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 12/10/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/10/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/12/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 12/12/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 12/13/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/19/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 12/19/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 01/23/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/23/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/23/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/23/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 01/25/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 01/25/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 01/25/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/04/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/04/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/04/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/05/2002
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/06/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/12/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/25/2002