Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/29/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/30/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/07/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/05/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/04/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/04/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/04/2002
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/08/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/11/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/11/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/20/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/08/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/23/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/04/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/24/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/23/2002