Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 07/20/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/19/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/19/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/19/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/19/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/21/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/02/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/04/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/08/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/13/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 12/07/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/07/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/13/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 12/20/2001